skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 1:11:48 PM

Khan, Farah Imtiaz

CPSO#: 99089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Asthma & Allergy Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918 Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active
                   Dr. Farah Imtiaz Khan may practice medicine independently in paediatrics
                  and clinical immunology and allergy, only.