skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:14:03 AM

Hsin, Michael Kuan Yew

CPSO#: 98949

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cambridge, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013