skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:31:40 AM

Parotto, Matteo

CPSO#: 98850

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Apr 2015
EXPIRY DATE
13 Apr 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Apr 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Padova, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia and
Pain Management
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3-442
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matteo Parotto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parotto ( CPSO# 98850 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia and
Pain Management
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street, EN3-442
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3567


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 31 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 31 Mar 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 13 Apr 2022

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Matteo Parotto may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Parotto holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Parotto  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Parotto's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Parotto's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  April  14,  2015. In accorddance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on April 13, 2022.