skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:58:52 AM

Canning, Stephanie Denise

CPSO#: 98563

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gatroenterology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 82197 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gatroenterology
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephanie D. Canning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Canning ( CPSO# 98563 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DENISE CANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2017 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016