skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 11:47:46 PM

Sethi, Baldev Raj

CPSO#: 98503

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Glasgow, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Baldev Sethi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 21 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact: For patients at the Stittsville Medical Centre: Medical Centre 1251 Main Street Stittsville ON K2S 2E5 For patients at the Vanier Family Care Medical Centre: Vanier Family Care Medical Centre 1237 Donald Street Ottawa ON K1J 8W3 For patients at the Kanata Medical Centre: Kanata Medical Centre 5357 Fernbank Road Kanata ON K2S 1B6
Date Received: 15 Nov 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Beldev Raj Sethi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 11, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Sethi’s prescribing practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Sethi resigned from the College effective December 31, 2018, and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)