skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:40:34 AM

Hussain, Aleem

CPSO#: 98469

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Wayne State University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Health+Plex
5995 14th Ave
Unit A2B
Markham ON  L3S 0A2
Phone: (289)-859-9901
Fax: 905-201-6565 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aleem Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hussain ( CPSO# 98469 )

Business Address:
Suite A2
5995 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L3S 0A2
Phone Number: (289) 859-9901

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEEM HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014