skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:56:02 PM

Ghate, Gauri

CPSO#: 98454

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
Room E1-105
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 57956 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Ghate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ghate ( CPSO# 98454 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
Room E1 - 105
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAURI GHATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017