skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:34:54 PM

Gao, Andrew Feng

CPSO#: 98164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW FENG GAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019