skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 2:31:09 PM

Heringer, Matthew Jeffrey

CPSO#: 98149

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Dr. Heringer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JEFFREY HERINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2015