skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:41:23 PM

Misch, Michael Robert

CPSO#: 98122

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael R. Misch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Misch ( CPSO# 98122 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT MISCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014