skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:40:19 PM

Eldjama, Tarik

CPSO#: 97902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harbourview Clinic
Suite 4
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-3008 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

QHC Prince Edward Country
Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-1008
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tarik Eldjama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Eldjama ( CPSO# 97902 )

Business Address:
Harbourview Clinic
Suite 4
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-3008

Business Address:
QHC Prince Edward Country Memorial Hospital
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-2181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARIK ELDJAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDJAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014