skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:55:41 AM

Ashton, Rosalind Julia Clare

CPSO#: 97786

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5 Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROSALIND JULIA CLARE ASHTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ASHTON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ASHTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ASHTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ASHTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ASHTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ASHTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019