skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 8:59:13 AM

Dooley, Jessica Dunn

CPSO#: 97784

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 90027
Golf Links Road PO
Ancaster ON  L9K 3K0
Phone: 905-664-9992 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA DUNN DOOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2017