skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:07:17 AM

De Zoysa, Maya Kanthi

CPSO#: 97675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 102
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone: 705-586-2080
Fax: 705-479-5100 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

107 Shirreff Ave
Suite 204
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Canada
Phone: 705-586-2080
Fax: 705-479-5100
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAYA KANTHI DE ZOYSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ZOYSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016