skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:08:56 PM

Molnar, Iulia Alina

CPSO#: 97545

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: Bogza, Iulia Alina (used until: 22 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Highway 105
Red Lake ON  P0V2M0
Phone: 8077272617 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

1500 Dundas St East
Mississauga ON  L4X1L4
Canada
Phone: 905-212-1433
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit # 10
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd
Toronto ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: 416-741-2273
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 110-111
3550 Derry Rd E
Mississauga ON  L4T4E3
Canada
Phone: 905-672-2273
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit # 2
4000 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: 905-851-3777
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

7199 Gelert Rd
Haliburton ON  K0M1S0
Canada
Phone: 705-457-1392
Fax: 705-457-2398
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Iulia Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Molnar ( CPSO# 97545 )

Business Address:
55 Hwy 105
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone Number: (807) 727-2617

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 212-1433

Business Address:
4000 Hwy 7
Unit 2
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 851-3777

Business Address:
200 - 66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 922-0566

Business Address:
7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1392

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IULIA ALINA MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014