skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/05/2019 11:36:19 PM

Tjandrawidjaja, Michael Clarence

CPSO#: 97487

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 May 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6221
Fax: (905) 494-6717 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Tjandrawidjaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tjandrawidjaja ( CPSO# 97487 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CLARENCE TJANDRAWIDJAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJANDRAWIDJAJA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Jun 2018
Summary:

On June 25, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Michael Clarence Tjandrawidjaja 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Tjandrawidjaja is a physician who currently practises as a cardiologist in Brampton. He received 
his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 2012. At the time of the 
incidents described below, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja was a member of the Ontario Medical Association 
(“OMA”), the association that represents the political and economic interests of physicians in Ontario. 
It is the exclusive representative of Ontario physicians in negotiations with the Province of Ontario. 
 
Tentative Physician Services Agreement (“tPSA”) 
 
On July 11, 2016, the OMA and the Ontario government reached a tentative agreement dealing with 
government funding for physician services and changes to the physician fee schedule, among other 
issues, tPSA. The tPSA was to have a term of four years, and would have replaced a previous 
agreement, which terminated in 2014. The tPSA was endorsed by the OMA’s Board, including by Dr. 
Virginia Walley, who was President of the OMA at the time. The OMA promoted the agreement in the 
weeks leading up to a General Meeting, which took place on August 14, 2016. On August 14, 2016, 
the OMA membership voted to reject the tPSA. 
 
Dr. Tjandrawidjaja’s email of July 31 and August 8, 2016 
 
On July 30, 2016, OMA members received an email providing information regarding an upcoming 
vote to ratify the tPSA. The email encouraged members to vote in favour of the agreement. It was sent 
from an email address used by OMA staff to communicate publicly about the tPSA, and was signed by 
Dr. Walley. On July 31, 2016, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja replied by sending the following email to Dr. 
Walley: “You are a turd”. On August 8, 2016, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja sent the following email directly to 
Dr. Walley’s personal email address: “Virginia, how much are the liberals bribing you? It will likely 
come out at some point.” The emails sent by Dr. Tjandrawidjaja were viewed by Dr. Walley as well as 
OMA staff who monitored the tPSA email address. 
 
Dr. Tjandrawidjaja’s response during investigation  
 
Dr. Tjandrawidjaja provided a response during the investigation, acknowledging the emails were 
inappropriate, stating that he regretted sending them, and indicating he wished to apologize to Dr 
Walley, among other things. In November 2017, Dr. Tjandrawidjaja completed 4.5 hours of one-on-
one Professional Communication coaching with Dawn Martin, Communications Specialist and 
Educational Consultant, to develop skills related to professional communication and collaboration with 
colleagues.  
 
Disposition 
 
On June 25, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-   Dr. Tjandrawidjaja appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-   Dr. Tjandrawidjaja pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000 within 
    thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): June 25, 2018