skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:19:36 PM

Tan, Michael Chung Yin

CPSO#: 97484

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville-Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
4001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 2971 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M.C. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tan ( CPSO# 97484 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
4001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHUNG YIN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015