skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:54:19 PM

Persaud, Michelle Shalene

CPSO#: 97289

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012