skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 12:29:12 AM

Dash, Satya

CPSO#: 97048

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Oriya

Education:St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital, 12EN
Division of Adult Endocrinology
and Metabolism
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. X8094
Fax: 4163403314 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dash Lemos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lemos ( CPSO# 93244 )
Dr. S. Dash ( CPSO# 97048 )

Business Address:
Ryerson Medical Centre
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3

Business Address:
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Suite 300
Box 5
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 960-1366

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Adult Endocrinology and Metabolism
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 581-7487

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
P.O. Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SATYA DASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2011 to 14 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015