skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:56:14 AM

Anttila, Vesa Jyrki Juhani

CPSO#: 96944

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Oulu, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2011 to 12 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012