skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 11:46:58 PM

Martin, Nicholas Robert

CPSO#: 96882

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeview FHT
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone: (613) 394-0770
Fax: (613) 480-6588 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicholas Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Martin ( CPSO# 96882 )

Business Address:
Quinte West Medical Centre
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone Number: (613) 394-4620

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ROBERT MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2014