skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:42:01 PM

Al Sannan, Baydaa F A D

CPSO#: 96836

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2013