skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 4:28:05 PM

Al Braiki, Laila Mohammed Omar Mohammed

CPSO#: 96774

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Care of the Elderly

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2011