skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:13:10 PM

Mastouri, Negin

CPSO#: 96679

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
398 Royal York Rd
Toronto ON  M8Y 2R5
Phone: (416) 201-0836
Fax: 4162590184 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mastouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mastouri ( CPSO# 96679 )

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5

Business Address:
100 East Street South
Bobcaygeon ON  K0M 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 738-5575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEGIN MASTOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 20 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2014