skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:26:01 PM

Naaman, Saad Cyril

CPSO#: 96638

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Jul 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Turkish

Education:University of Baghdad, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Dept of Phys Med and Rehabilitation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Marchuk ( CPSO# 90047 )
Dr. S. Naaman ( CPSO# 96638 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Phys Med and Rehabiliation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5184


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 26 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2013 Active
                   Dr.  Saad  Cyril  Naaman  may practise medicine independently in physical
                  medicine and rehabilitation, only.