skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:46:47 PM

Ashworth, Alan David

CPSO#: 96620

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 06 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 2012