skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:15:15 PM

Hossain, Nasreen

CPSO#: 96271

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Rajshahi Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dorchester Medical Center
2- 4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester ON  N0L 1G3
Phone: (519) 202-7391 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 202-7394 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. N. Hossain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. HOSSAIN ( CPSO# 96271 )

Business Address:
4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester ON  N0L 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 202-7391


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Bangladesh

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NASREEN HOSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013