skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:32:35 AM

Stubbs, Euan Graeme Crowther

CPSO#: 96256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jan 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Imagus Inc
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-1465
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Ancaster Xray and Ultrasound
1144 WIlson St West
Ancaster
Hamilton ON  L9G 3K9
Canada
Phone: 905 648 5900
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Ultrasound and Diagnostic
200 James street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-2220
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St Joseph's Center Ambulatory
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 573-7777
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300


Corporation Name: E. Stubbs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Suite G1
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (905) 522-2220

Business Address:
104-1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Euan Graeme Crowther Stubbs may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Stubbs holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Stubbs  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Stubbs' clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Stubbs' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 1, 2016, and expires on June 30,
                  2022. Upon renewal of Dr. Stubbs' academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.