skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 11:56:12 PM

Sakran, Mahmoud Hassan Mohamed Ali

CPSO#: 96184

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Sep 2014
EXPIRY DATE
21 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Sep 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Sana'a, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sakran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sakran ( CPSO# 96184 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Mahmoud Hassan Mohamed Ali Sakran may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Pediatrics, Queen's University, in which Dr. Sakran holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                        
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sakran  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sakran's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sakran's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 22, 2014. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 21, 2021.