skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:41:00 PM

Gnanendrarajah, Garthiga

CPSO#: 96125

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dox Medical
2683 Lawrence Ave. East
Unit 5
Scarborough ON  M1P 2S2
Phone: (416) 299-0710
Fax: (416) 299-1653 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Gnanendrarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gnanendrarajah ( CPSO# 96125 )

Business Address:
Dox Medical
2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Unit 5
Scarborough ON  M1P 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 299-0710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GARTHIGA GNANENDRARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GNANENDRARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013