skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 11:11:11 PM

Finnigan, Daniel Frank

CPSO#: 96081

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 836-9440
Fax: (519) 836-9530 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-3120
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Finnigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Finnigan ( CPSO# 96081 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 836-9440

Business Address:
Listowel General Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3125

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL FRANK FINNIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINNIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013