skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:25:35 AM

Gill, Natasha Kaur

CPSO#: 96077

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Dufferin Wellness Centre
712 Main St. E
Shelburne ON  L9V 2Z4
Phone: 226-259-9000
Fax: 226-486-0126 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H.S. Grover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Grover ( CPSO# 84970 )
Dr. N. Gill ( CPSO# 96077 )

Business Address:
712 Main Street East
Shelburne ON  L9V 2Z4
Phone Number: (226) 259-9000

Business Address:
Suite 132
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 938-5644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA KAUR GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014