skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 8:55:23 PM

Bursey, Tiffany Elizabeth

CPSO#: 95683

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Penticton Regional Hospital
550 Carmi Ave
Penticton BC  V2A 3G6
Phone: 250-492-4000

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tiffany Bursey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bursey ( CPSO# 95683 )

Business Address:
550 Carmi Avenue
Penticton BC  V2A 3G6


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIFFANY ELIZABETH BURSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURSEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2013