skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 11:41:26 PM

Petis, Stephen Michael

CPSO#: 95410

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Athlone Avenue, Suite 104
Woodstock ON  N4V0B8
Phone: 5195336970
Fax: 5195336971 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S Petis L McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Petis ( CPSO# 95410 )
Dr. L. McAuley ( CPSO# 95106 )

Business Address:
Western University
UCC - Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Business Address:
Suite 104
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 533-6970

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL PETIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016