skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 8:02:33 AM

Ismail, Mohamed Abdel Hadi Elmorsi

CPSO#: 95203

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1030 Quellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 34421
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ismail ( CPSO# 95203 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 2, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 8, 2019, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 85.2(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective November 2, 2018, Dr. Mohamed Ismail voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at WRH, and that effective November 16, 2018, Dr. Ismail agreed to take a leave of absence from WRH during which he would not exercise his privileges at WRH and not provide anesthesia services at any other hospital or facility.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ABDEL HADI ELMORSI ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017