skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:37:18 AM

Mukherjee, Sutapa

CPSO#: 95039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Adelaide, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Womens College Hospital 76 Grenville Street Toronto, ON M5S 1B2
Date Received: 15 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014