skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 2:10:44 PM

Denobriga, Lisa Michelle

CPSO#: 94923

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone: (519) 396-6773 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Denobriga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Denobriga ( CPSO# 94923 )

Business Address:
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-6773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013 Active
             Dr.  Lisa  Michelle  Denobriga  may  practice  medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.