skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:21:10 AM

Anandakrishnan, Suresh

CPSO#: 94784

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 17 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011