skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:07:53 AM

Starmer, Gregory Hogarth

CPSO#: 94762

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Queensland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jan 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Feb 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011