skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:38:45 PM

Pascual Sedano, Berta Maria

CPSO#: 94653

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Valladolid, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 22 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2011 to 03 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2011