skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:44:19 AM

Tung, Taranjit Singh

CPSO#: 94597

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Greenwood St
Campbell River BC  V9W 6K5
Phone: (250) 914-8799
Fax: 778 346 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

British Columbia

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARANJIT SINGH TUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2010 to 15 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2015