skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:08:53 PM

Shaikh, Naureen Azhar

CPSO#: 94504

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Appleby Medical
Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 315-9929
Fax: (905) 315-9314 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton Family care centre
& Walk in Clinic
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: (905) 864-9393
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Halton Medix WIC &Family Practice
550 Ontario Street South Milton ON
Milton ON  L9T 5E4
Canada
Phone: 289-812-0194
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naureen A. Shaikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Shaikh ( CPSO# 94504 )

Business Address:
Upper Appleby Medical
Suite 36
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 315-9929

Business Address:
Milton Family Care Centre and Walk In Clinic
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone Number: (905) 864-9898

Business Address:
Suite 9
550 Ontario St. South
Milton ON  L9T 5E4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAUREEN AZHAR SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2012 to 15 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012