skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/05/2019 11:28:51 PM

Wimmer, Curt Juergen

CPSO#: 94455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1083 Ouellette
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

194 Talbot Street W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 519-326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

22101 Morross
Detroit MI  48236
United States
Phone: 313-343-4000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wimmer ( CPSO# 94455 )
Dr. M. Narewal ( CPSO# 81393 )

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8

Business Address:
145 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active
             Dr. Curt Juergen Wimmer may practice medicine independently in Emergency
            Medicine and Pain Medicine, only.