skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:00:29 AM

Soros, Peter

CPSO#: 94290

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Hanover Medical School, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 09 Aug 2010 to 16 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012