skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:18:14 PM

Melnychuk, David Stuart

CPSO#: 94163

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012