skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:06:05 PM

Korsheed, Shvan

CPSO#: 94072

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Sulaimani, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Korsheed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Korsheed ( CPSO# 94072 )

Business Address:
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHVAN KORSHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORSHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012