skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:49:16 AM

Lazaric, Daniel Mario

CPSO#: 93883

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Wilderman Medical Clinic 100 - 8054 Yonge St Thronhill ON L4J 1W3
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Nova Scotia

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2019