skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:18:00 PM

Ashdown, Lynn Colleen

CPSO#: 93766

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Peter Morand Crescent
Suite 201
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z3
Phone: 613-562-5800 Ext. 2982 Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LYNN COLLEEN ASHDOWN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ASHDOWN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ASHDOWN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ASHDOWN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ASHDOWN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ASHDOWN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ASHDOWN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020