skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/05/2019 11:54:56 PM

Wilson, Meghan Dawn

CPSO#: 93041

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Canadian Forces Health Services
26 Somme Ave
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541-5010 Ext. 5508 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen's Department of Family Medici
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 533 9300
Fax: (613) 544 9899
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.D. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 93041 )

Business Address:
33 Canadian Health Forces, 26 Somme Avenue
Services Unit
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone Number: (613) 541-5010

Business Address:
Queen's Family Health
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEGHAN DAWN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Mar 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013