skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:30:23 AM

Lee, Jonathan Chia-Ho

CPSO#: 92935

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Address of the clinic for Hong Fook - 409 - 4040 Finch Avenue E, Toronto, ON M1S 4V5
Date Received: 25 Apr 2019


Address: Medical Records for CAMH will be housed digitally at: CAMH 1001 Queen St W Toronto ON M6J 1H4. Hong Fook Nurse Practitioner Clnic records will be housed at the clinic. Records from LOFT will be housed digitally at Inner City Health Associates
Date Received: 25 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019